Donate
Wintreath ▼
Regional Forums
Discord
Region Page
Steam Group
Menu ▼
Login
Register
Community
Regional Forums
Discord
NationStates
Region Page
Steam Group
Contribute
Donate
Login
Register
Recent
Wintreath
»
The Dumping Grounds - Spam Games
»
View Topic
Pages:
1
...
24
[25]
26
...
32
STAR WARS: A LINE BY LINE REENACTMENT OF THE PREQUELS
Posts:
474
Views:
13896
Pages:
1
...
24
[25]
26
...
32
attach
More
Print
Post #161508
October 09, 2021, 12:38:13 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161508
October 09, 2021, 12:38:13 AM
Beep beep beep beep boop boop!
1 person likes this post:
Red Mones
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161516
October 10, 2021, 04:10:30 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161516
October 10, 2021, 04:10:30 AM
... the death toll is catastrophic...we must bow to their wishes... you must contact me ...
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161530
October 13, 2021, 02:48:51 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161530
October 13, 2021, 02:48:51 AM
It's a trick. Send no reply.
Send no transmission of any kind.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161533
October 13, 2021, 04:39:17 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161533
October 13, 2021, 04:39:17 AM
It sounds like bait to establish a connection trace.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161535
October 13, 2021, 03:23:54 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161535
October 13, 2021, 03:23:54 PM
What if it is true and the people are dying?
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161536
October 13, 2021, 09:12:42 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161536
October 13, 2021, 09:12:42 PM
Either way, we're running out of time.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161539
October 13, 2021, 09:50:15 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161539
October 13, 2021, 09:50:15 PM
Tatooine is sparsely populated. If the trace was correct, I will find them quickly, Master.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161540
October 14, 2021, 02:55:24 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161540
October 14, 2021, 02:55:24 AM
Move against the Jedi first...you will then have no difficulty in taking the Queen to Naboo to sign the treaty.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161542
October 14, 2021, 03:11:33 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161542
October 14, 2021, 03:11:33 AM
At last we will reveal ourselves to the Jedi. At last we will have revenge.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161550
October 15, 2021, 09:35:16 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161550
October 15, 2021, 09:35:16 PM
You have been well trained, my young apprentice, they will be no match for you.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161563
October 18, 2021, 12:57:25 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161563
October 18, 2021, 12:57:25 AM
All slaves have a transmitter placed inside their bodies somewhere. I've been working on a scanner to try and locate mine. Any attempt to escape- And they blow you up! Boom!
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161571
October 18, 2021, 05:58:56 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161571
October 18, 2021, 05:58:56 AM
How wude.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161574
October 18, 2021, 08:56:18 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161574
October 18, 2021, 08:56:18 PM
I can't believe there's still slavery in the galaxy. The Republic's antislavery laws-
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161580
October 20, 2021, 03:10:54 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161580
October 20, 2021, 03:10:54 AM
The Republic doesn't exist out here...we must survive on our own.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161582
October 20, 2021, 02:14:06 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161582
October 20, 2021, 02:14:06 PM
Excuse me.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Pages:
1
...
24
[25]
26
...
32
attach
More
Print
Pages:
1
...
24
[25]
26
...
32