Donate
Wintreath ▼
Regional Forums
Discord
Region Page
Steam Group
Menu ▼
Login
Register
Community
Regional Forums
Discord
NationStates
Region Page
Steam Group
Contribute
Donate
Login
Register
Recent
Wintreath
»
The Dumping Grounds - Spam Games
»
View Topic
Pages:
1
...
19
[20]
21
...
32
STAR WARS: A LINE BY LINE REENACTMENT OF THE PREQUELS
Posts:
474
Views:
14001
Pages:
1
...
19
[20]
21
...
32
attach
More
Print
Post #161157
August 17, 2021, 01:17:50 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161157
August 17, 2021, 01:17:50 AM
All my life.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161163
August 18, 2021, 09:58:00 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161163
August 18, 2021, 09:58:00 PM
How long have you been here?
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161165
August 19, 2021, 12:42:37 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161165
August 19, 2021, 12:42:37 AM
Since I was very little, three, I think. My Mom and I were sold to Gardulla the Hutt, but she lost us, betting on the Podraces.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161185
August 20, 2021, 11:28:20 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161185
August 20, 2021, 11:28:20 PM
You're ... a slave?
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161213
August 27, 2021, 06:08:21 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161213
August 27, 2021, 06:08:21 AM
I'm a person and my name is Anakin.
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161216
August 27, 2021, 06:21:27 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161216
August 27, 2021, 06:21:27 PM
I'm sorry. I don't fully understand. This is a strange place to me.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161222
August 29, 2021, 08:46:38 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161222
August 29, 2021, 08:46:38 AM
Hey...
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161225
August 30, 2021, 02:58:49 AM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161225
August 30, 2021, 02:58:49 AM
Wha?
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161229
August 30, 2021, 07:20:07 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161229
August 30, 2021, 07:20:07 AM
Hit the nose!
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161232
August 30, 2021, 07:05:57 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161232
August 30, 2021, 07:05:57 PM
Oh!
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161249
September 01, 2021, 07:45:08 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161249
September 01, 2021, 07:45:08 PM
... a T-14 hyperdrive generator!! Thee in luck, I'm the only one hereabouts who has one... but thee might as well buy a new ship. It would be cheaper, I think... Saying of which, how's thee going to pay for all this?
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161251
September 01, 2021, 08:19:55 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161251
September 01, 2021, 08:19:55 PM
I have 20,000 Republic dataries.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161253
September 02, 2021, 01:08:49 AM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161253
September 02, 2021, 01:08:49 AM
Republic credits?!? Republic credits are no good out here. I need something more real...
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Post #161256
September 02, 2021, 04:56:49 PM
Red Mones
Citizen
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Post #161256
September 02, 2021, 04:56:49 PM
I don't have anything else. But credits will do fine.
Red Mones
Wintreath's Official Money Launderer
Posts: 7,005
Karma: 2,202
Citizen
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Burdock
Wintreath Nation
Red Mones
Logged
Post #161258
September 02, 2021, 08:30:24 PM
taulover
Regional Stability Squad
Seeker of Knowledge
Post #161258
September 02, 2021, 08:30:24 PM
No, they won'ta!
Résumé
Wintreath:
Citizen: 8 April 2015 - present
From the Ashes RP Game Master: 29 November 2015 - 24 July 2018
Skydande Vakt Marshal: 29 November 2015 - 28 February 2017
Skrifa of the 13th Underhusen: 13 December 2015 - 8 February 2016
RP Guild Councillor: 9 February 2016 - 6 March 2018
Ambassador to Lovely: 23 February 2016 - 17 August 2016
Werewolf VII co-host: 11 May 2016 - 5 June 2016
Skrifa of the 18th Underhusen: 8 October 2016 - 7 December 2016
Ambassador to Balder: 1 December 2016 - 1 March 2022
Skrifa of the 19th Underhusen: 7 December 2016 - 9 February 2017
Ambassador to the INWU: 11 March 2017 - 1 March 2022
Ambassador to the Versutian Federation: 18 August 2017 - 22 March 2018
Thane of Integration: 29 September 2017 - 7 March 2018
Speaker of the 24th Underhusen: 10 October 2017 - 7 December 2017
October 2017 Wintreath's Finest: 4 November 2017
Speaker pro tempore of the 25th Underhusen: 9 December 2017 - 7 February 2018
Wintreath's Finest of 2017: 6 January 2018
Werewolf XIV host: 20 January 2018 - 23 February 2018
February 2018 Wintreath's Finest: 5 March 2018
Thane of Embassy Dispatches / Foreign Releases and Information / Foreign Dispatches: 7 March 2018 - 15 March 2020
Speaker of the 28th Underhusen: 10 June 2018 - 7 August 2018
Second Patriarch of the Noble House of Valeria: 10 October 2018 - present
Arena Game 6 Host: 28 December 2018 - 9 March 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 29 January 2019 - 12 February 2019
Speaker of the 32nd Underhusen: 12 February 2019 - 8 April 2019
March 2019 Wintreath's Finest: 4 April 2019
Librarian of the Underhusen: 12 April 2019 - 23 October 2020
Commendation of Wintreath: 24 September 2020
Peer of the Overhusen: 9 December 2020 - 8 February 2021
Vice Chancellor of the Landsraad: 26 May 2021 - 15 September 2022
Arena Game 8 Host: 10 June 2021 - 19 July 2021
June 2021 Wintreath's Finest: 5 July 2021
Regional Stability Squad: 28 February 2023 - present
Minecraft Server Admin: 8 March 2023 - present
Aura Hyperia/New Hyperion:
Plebeian: 16 April 2014 - 21 July 2014
Patrician: 21 July 2014 - present
Adeptus Mechanicus: 24 October 2014 - 16 November 2014
Co-founder of New Hyperion: 29 October 2014 - present
Lord of Propaganda: 16 November 2014 - present
Mapmaker for Official Region RP: 27 November 2015 - present
WACom Delegate: 11 November 2017 - present
Other positions: Hyperian Guardsman, Hyperian Marine (Rank: Scout)
taulover
Seeker of Knowledge
Posts: 13,215
Karma: 4,250
Regional Stability Squad
Pronouns
He/Him/His
Familial House
Valeria
Wintreath Nation
Alcubierre
Logged
Pages:
1
...
19
[20]
21
...
32
attach
More
Print
Pages:
1
...
19
[20]
21
...
32